US HB4827 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 95-7)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Employee Retroactive Pay Fairness Act This bill requires federal employees furloughed due to a lapse in appropriations that begins on or about January 19, 2018, to be compensated at their standard rate of compensation for the period of such lapse as soon as practicable after such lapse ends.
Title
Federal Employee Retroactive Pay Fairness Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4694 (Related) 2017-12-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB4961 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB5391 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB4961 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB5391 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Appropriations
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4827/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4827/BILLS-115hr4827ih.pdf |