US HB4840 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 536.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 536.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of the Interior to acquire specified private or state lands or interests in land from willing sellers in order to expand the boundaries of the Casa Grande Ruins National Monument. As consideration for the acquisition of the lands, unless such lands are donated, Interior must (1) pay fair market value; or (2) convey to the land owners federal lands, interest in federal land, or any other federal asset of equal value located in Arizona. Two additional parcels of land are also to be included in the Casa Grande Ruins National Monument. One parcel of 3.8 acres is currently being administered by the Bureau of Land Management. The other parcel of 7.41 acres is currently being administered by the Bureau of Indian Affairs (BIA) and is exchanged for 3.5 acres currently being administered by the National Park Service. The land transferred to the BIA is to be used for the San Carlos Irrigation Project. Interior may enter into an agreement with Arizona to provide for cooperative management of approximately 200 acres of specified state trust lands.
Title
Casa Grande Ruins National Monument Boundary Modification Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 536. |
2020-12-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-652. |
2020-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2020-07-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-11-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3119 (Related) 2020-03-04 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Arizona
Historic sites and heritage areas
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Water use and supply
Historic sites and heritage areas
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Water use and supply