US HB4841 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Reserve Board, the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, and the National Credit Union Administration to report semiannually and testify annually on their supervisory and regulatory responsibilities and activities.
Title
Prudential Regulator Oversight Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] |
Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2020-01-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H189-190) |
2020-01-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4841. |
2020-01-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H189-192) |
2020-01-13 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-31 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 55 - 0. |
2019-10-31 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Congressional oversight
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Congressional oversight
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives