US HB485 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs to treat ambulance services as reimbursable emergency services in certain circumstances. Specifically, services are reimbursable when (1) the ambulance request was made because of the sudden onset of a medical condition that would reasonably be expected to be hazardous to the individual in the absence of immediate medical attention, and (2) the individual is transported to the closest and most appropriate medical facility capable of treating such emergency medical condition.
Title
VREASA Veterans Reimbursement for Emergency Ambulance Services Act
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] |
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] |
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2392 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/485/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr485/BILLS-116hr485ih.pdf |