US HB4852 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide specified information to veterans and members of the Armed Forces about postsecondary educational institutions. Specifically, the VA must provide information on whether a postsecondary educational institution (1) is listed on the College Navigator website as being affiliated with a religion, (2) has been declared a minority serving institution, and (3) is gender specific. The VA shall provide the required information in a searchable format on the VA website.
Title
G.I. and Veterans Education Empowerment Act GIVE Act
Sponsors
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 72 (Y: 412 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-02-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 0 (Roll no. 72). (text: 02/25/2020 CR H1175-1176) |
2020-02-26 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1212) |
2020-02-25 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-02-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4852. |
2020-02-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1175-1176) |
2020-02-25 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-11-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-10-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Educational facilities and institutions
Government information and archives
Higher education
Minority education
Religion
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women's education
Educational facilities and institutions
Government information and archives
Higher education
Minority education
Religion
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women's education