US HB4861 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a competitive grant program for up to 40 hospitals with emergency departments and certain on-site professionals to help connect patients in emergency departments who are at risk of suicide with treatment and mental health services. Grants may be used to train emergency department providers and establish certain policies and procedures related to the identification, assessment, and treatment of, and care coordination for, individuals who are at risk of suicide. In awarding the grants, the Department of Health and Human Services may give preference to specified types of hospitals, such as critical access hospitals and hospitals in areas with suicide rates higher than the national average.
Title
Effective Suicide Screening and Assessment in the Emergency Department Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5017) |
2020-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4861. |
2020-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5017-5019) |
2020-09-29 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 443. |
2020-09-29 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-543. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-10-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3006 (Related) 2019-12-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Mental health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Mental health