US HB4866 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the 21st Century Cures Act to provide for designation of institutions of higher education that provide research, data, and leadership on continuous manufacturing as National Centers of Excellence in Continuous Pharmaceutical Manufacturing, and for other purposes.
Title
National Centers of Excellence in Continuous Pharmaceutical Manufacturing Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4616-4617) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4866. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4616-4618) |
2020-09-21 | House | Mrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 413. |
2020-09-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-513. |
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-10-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Congressional oversight
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Manufacturing
Prescription drugs
Product development and innovation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Congressional oversight
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Manufacturing
Prescription drugs
Product development and innovation
Research administration and funding
Research and development