US HB4874 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Department of Agriculture Reorganization Act of 1994 to establish the Rural Innovation and Partnership Administration and to amend the Consolidated Farm and Rural Development Act to establish the Rural Future Partnership Fund to invest in the rural areas of the United States to achieve their preferred future while maximizing their contribution to the well-being of the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
Rebuild Rural America Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2019-10-30 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8608) |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2704 (Same As) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Agricultural trade
Agriculture and food
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Building construction
Business investment and capital
Child care and development
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Cooperative and condominium housing
Department of Agriculture
Disability and paralysis
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Economic development
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment and training programs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Farmland
Food assistance and relief
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Higher education
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing supply and affordability
Indian social and development programs
Infrastructure development
Internet and video services
Land use and conservation
Libraries and archives
Low- and moderate-income housing
Manufacturing
Mental health
National and community service
Nutrition and diet
Outdoor recreation
Performance measurement
Pollution liability
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public transit
Public-private cooperation
Regional and metropolitan planning
Research administration and funding
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Rural conditions and development
Small business
Small towns
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Technology transfer and commercialization
Telephone and wireless communication
Transportation programs funding
Unemployment
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Water quality
Water use and supply
Youth employment and child labor
Agricultural trade
Agriculture and food
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Building construction
Business investment and capital
Child care and development
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Cooperative and condominium housing
Department of Agriculture
Disability and paralysis
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Economic development
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment and training programs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Executive agency funding and structure
Farmland
Food assistance and relief
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Higher education
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing supply and affordability
Indian social and development programs
Infrastructure development
Internet and video services
Land use and conservation
Libraries and archives
Low- and moderate-income housing
Manufacturing
Mental health
National and community service
Nutrition and diet
Outdoor recreation
Performance measurement
Pollution liability
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public transit
Public-private cooperation
Regional and metropolitan planning
Research administration and funding
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Rural conditions and development
Small business
Small towns
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Technology transfer and commercialization
Telephone and wireless communication
Transportation programs funding
Unemployment
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Water quality
Water use and supply
Youth employment and child labor
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4874/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4874/BILLS-116hr4874ih.pdf |