US HB4876 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Education to establish a pilot program that awards grants to institutions of higher education for a program to provide students with work opportunities.
Title
Earning Experience Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-10-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB792 (Related) 2019-01-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB3101 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
HB4674 (Related) 2020-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 583.
HB3101 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
HB4674 (Related) 2020-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 583.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Student records
Temporary and part-time employment
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Student records
Temporary and part-time employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4876/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4876/BILLS-116hr4876ih.pdf |