US HB4881 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to ensure that consumers can make informed decisions in choosing between meat products such as beef and imitation meat products, and for other purposes.
Title
Real MEAT Act of 2019 Real Marketing Edible Artificials Truthfully Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] |
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] |
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] |
Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. John Rose [R-TN] |
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3016 (Related) 2019-12-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4881/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4881/BILLS-116hr4881ih.pdf |