US HB4890 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide benefits for noncitizen members of the Armed Forces, and for other purposes.
Title
Veteran Deportation Prevention and Reform Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-11-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5151 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Border security and unlawful immigration
Citizenship and naturalization
Congressional oversight
Family relationships
Government studies and investigations
Immigration status and procedures
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Border security and unlawful immigration
Citizenship and naturalization
Congressional oversight
Family relationships
Government studies and investigations
Immigration status and procedures
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4890/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4890/BILLS-116hr4890ih.pdf |