US HB4910 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Became Public Law No: 115-184.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Became Public Law No: 115-184.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Cemetery Benefit Correction Act (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of the Interior to provide outer burial receptacles for veterans' remains buried in a national cemetery administered by the National Park Service. (An outer burial receptacle is a container, such as a grave liner or a burial vault, that protects a casket in the ground and prevents the grave from sinking.) Interior may provide reimbursement for outer burial receptacles other than grave liners but may require survivors to pay: (1) the costs by which such burial receptacle exceeds the costs of a grave liner, and (2) related administrative costs.
Title
Veterans Cemetery Benefit Correction Act
Sponsors
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] |
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Karen Handel [R-GA] |
Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 167 (Y: 388 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-184. |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2942) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 399. |
2018-05-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 0 (Roll no. 167). (text: CR H3753) |
2018-05-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3761-3762) |
2018-05-07 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-05-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4910. |
2018-05-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3753-3755) |
2018-05-07 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-03-20 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2372 (Related) 2018-06-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-182.
HR891 (Related) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR891 (Related) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.