US HB4935 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on October 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit chemical abortions performed without the presence of a healthcare provider, and for other purposes.
Title
Teleabortion Prevention Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] |
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] |
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-11-20 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H9064) |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-10-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3252 (Related) 2020-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Abortion
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4935/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4935/BILLS-116hr4935ih.pdf |