US HB4960 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H9160-9161)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H9160-9161)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Commerce to conduct an assessment and analysis of the reasons underlying the decreasing rate of formation of new businesses (i.e., startups) in the United States.
Title
Enhancing Entrepreneurship for the 21st Century Act
Sponsors
Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] |
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H9160-9161) |
2019-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2019-10-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-10-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2535 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 633.
Subjects
Aging
Business investment and capital
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Financial crises and stabilization
General business and commerce matters
Government studies and investigations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Student aid and college costs
Women in business
Business investment and capital
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Financial crises and stabilization
General business and commerce matters
Government studies and investigations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Student aid and college costs
Women in business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4960/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4960/BILLS-116hr4960ih.pdf |