US HB497 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Kinzinger asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 497, a bill originally introduced by Representative Hunter, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Kinzinger asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 497, a bill originally introduced by Representative Hunter, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amounts payable through the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) for (1) burial and funeral expenses of veterans, and (2) such expenses in connection with a veteran's death due to a service-connected disability. The VA shall also increase such amounts each fiscal year to account for inflation.
Title
BRAVE Act of 2019 Burial Rights for America’s Veterans’ Efforts Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Kinzinger asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 497, a bill originally introduced by Representative Hunter, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB598 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Disability and paralysis
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Cemeteries and funerals
Disability and paralysis
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/497/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr497/BILLS-116hr497ih.pdf |