US HB4971 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-242. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-242. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 15 East Market Street in Leesburg, Virginia, as the "Norman Duncan Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 15 East Market Street in Leesburg, Virginia, as the "Norman Duncan Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-21 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-242. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-21 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-11 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7220-7221) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-09-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5070) |
2020-09-30 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5070) |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged. |
2020-09-30 | House | Mr. Connolly asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2020-03-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-10-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Virginia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Virginia