US HB4977 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits postsecondary educational institutions from using federal funds to pay any person for (1) influencing Congress with respect to federal contracts, grants, loans, or cooperative agreements; or (2) lobbying Congress to secure funding through an earmark.
Title
Higher Education Funds Integrity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-11-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3487 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB3512 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB4674 (Related) 2020-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 583.
SB867 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB3512 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB4674 (Related) 2020-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 583.
SB867 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Congressional officers and employees
Education
Higher education
Members of Congress
Public participation and lobbying
Education
Higher education
Members of Congress
Public participation and lobbying
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4977/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4977/BILLS-116hr4977ih.pdf |