US HB4979 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Engrossed on September 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Advanced Nuclear Technology Development Act of 2016 This bill requires the Department of Energy (DOE) and the Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC) to enter into a memorandum of understanding to: ensure that DOE has sufficient technical expertise to support the civilian nuclear industry's timely development and commercial deployment of safe, innovative advanced reactor technology; ensure that the NRC has sufficient technical expertise to support the evaluation of requests for regulatory approval for advanced reactors; use computers and software codes to calculate the behavior and performance of advanced reactors based on mathematical models of their physical behavior; and ensure that the DOE maintains and develops the facilities to support the civilian nuclear industry's timely development and commercial deployment of safe, innovative reactor technology and ensuring that the NRC has access to such facilities, as needed. DOE must submit a report to Congress within 180 days evaluating activities intended to facilitate the testing and demonstration of advanced reactors on DOE land and facilities and the potential for DOE to test and demonstrate on private land. In addition, the NRC is required to develop a regulatory framework for licensing advanced nuclear reactors. This bill amends the Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1990 to require that the aggregate amount of fees collected by the NRC from licensees and certificate holders in a fiscal year be decreased by the amount of appropriations for activities related to the development of regulatory infrastructure for advanced nuclear reactor technologies.
Title
Advanced Nuclear Technology Development Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] |
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] |
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Frank Guinta [R-NH] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2016-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5305-5306) |
2016-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4979. |
2016-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5305-5308) |
2016-09-12 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-09-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 573. |
2016-09-12 | House | Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged. |
2016-09-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-737, Part I. |
2016-05-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-05-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2016-05-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2016-04-18 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2016-04-18 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2016-04-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-04-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2795 (Related) 2016-06-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 528.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Energy
Executive agency funding and structure
Licensing and registrations
Nuclear power
Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC)
User charges and fees
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Energy
Executive agency funding and structure
Licensing and registrations
Nuclear power
Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC)
User charges and fees