US HB4990 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the National Institute of Standards and Technology (NIST), the National Science Foundation (NSF), and other agencies to support research on voting systems. (Sec. 2) NIST, in collaboration with the NSF, must carry out research related to the security and integrity of voting systems. NIST shall make an award to an institution of higher education or a nonprofit organization to establish a Center of Excellence in Election Systems. (Sec. 3) The NSF, in collaboration with other agencies, shall award basic research grants to increase the understanding of cyber and other threats to voting systems and to inform the development of technologies, processes, and policies that contribute to more secure, fair, and accessible elections. The NSF shall award grants to institutions of higher education or nonprofit organizations to establish at least one multidisciplinary center for elections systems research and education. (Sec. 4) NIST shall establish and make available common data format specifications for auditing, voter registration, and other elements of voting systems. (Sec. 5) The General Accountability Office must report on, among other things, the extent to which NIST's efforts to assist in the development of voluntary voting systems guidelines have resulted in market-ready standardized voting equipment and software.
Title
Election Technology Research Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] |
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
2020-09-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4468-4469) |
2020-09-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4990. |
2020-09-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4468-4472) |
2020-09-16 | House | Ms. Sherrill moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 318. |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-396, Part I. |
2019-11-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Internet and video services
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Internet and video services
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications