US HB4995 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-9)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands initiatives to address maternal health in rural areas and promote innovation in the field. Specifically, the bill requires the Health Resources and Services Administration (HRSA) to establish rural obstetric networks for improving outcomes in birth and maternal morbidity through collaboration, training, and program evaluation. HRSA also must award demonstration program grants to (1) train physicians, medical residents, and other practitioners to provide maternal and obstetric services in rural communities; and (2) support academic programs that develop or provide training to improve maternal care in rural areas. Further, the bill adds maternal health services as part of the telehealth network and telehealth resource centers grant programs. The bill also makes a series of changes to the research and reporting requirements of the Department of Health and Human Services and the Government Accountability Office with respect to data on maternal health outcomes. Additionally, the bill establishes grants to (1) develop best practices to reduce preventable maternal mortality; (2) train health care professionals about reducing and preventing discrimination when providing maternal health services; (3) support the collaboration of professionals across health settings with respect to maternal health; (4) establish evidence-informed, integrated health care services for pregnant and postpartum women and their infants. HRSA also must contract with an independent research organization to study and make recommendations to accredited school training programs about discrimination and implicit and explicit biases.
Title
Maternal Health Quality Improvement Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] |
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4623-4625) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4995. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4623-4626) |
2020-09-21 | House | Mrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 414. |
2020-09-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-514. |
2019-11-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-13 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-11-13 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-11-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-11-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-09-09 | House | Hearings Held Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4215 (Related) 2019-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4243 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2373 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2586 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB4243 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2373 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2586 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Indian social and development programs
Medical education
Medical research
Minority health
Rural conditions and development
Women's health
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Indian social and development programs
Medical education
Medical research
Minority health
Rural conditions and development
Women's health