US HB4996 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-10)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows states to provide one year of postpartum coverage under Medicaid and the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP). (Current law requires 60 days of postpartum coverage.) The Government Accountability Office must report on information relating to implementation. Additionally, the Medicaid and CHIP Payment and Access Commission must report on specified information relating to coverage of doula services under state Medicaid programs, including coverage barriers and recommendations for improvement. The commission must also report on the use of bundled payments to reimburse providers for Medicaid pregnancy-related services. The bill also eliminates the cap on the total rebate amount for single source and innovator multiple source drugs under the Medicaid Drug Rebate Program beginning on January 1, 2023, and increases the funds available for the Medicaid Improvement Fund for state activities relating to mechanized claims systems beginning in FY2022.
Title
Helping MOMS Act of 2020 Helping Medicaid Offer Maternity Services Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] |
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] |
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] |
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5000-5001) |
2020-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4996. |
2020-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5000-5003) |
2020-09-29 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 428. |
2020-09-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-527. |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-13 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-11-13 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-11-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-11-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-09-09 | House | Hearings Held Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Same As/Similar To
HB107 (Related) 2019-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medicaid
Poverty and welfare assistance
Sex and reproductive health
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Women's health
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medicaid
Poverty and welfare assistance
Sex and reproductive health
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Women's health