US HB5021 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 337.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 337.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a debt collector from sending electronic communications to a consumer without the consumer's consent. The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) may not issue rules that allow a debt collector to send unlimited electronic communications. Additionally, the CFPB must report on consumer complaints about electronic communications and enforcement actions taken against debt collectors.
Title
Ending Debt Collection Harassment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 337. |
2020-03-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-418. |
2019-11-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 23. |
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-11-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4664 (Related) 2019-10-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Debt collection
Finance and financial sector
Telephone and wireless communication
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Debt collection
Finance and financial sector
Telephone and wireless communication