US HB5030 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small and Rural Community Clean Water Technical Assistance Act This bill amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to authorize the Environmental Protection Agency to provide grants or cooperative agreements to qualified technical assistance providers for assisting publicly owned treatment works (POTWs) that are small (serving 10,000 individuals or fewer) or medium (serving no fewer than 10,001 and not more than 75,000 individuals) in size. The technical assistance providers must assist the POTWs in complying with the Act or obtaining financing under the Act for eligible projects. Assistance may be provided to POTWs through onsite technical assistance, circuit rider technical assistance programs, regional technical assistance programs, and onsite and regional training.
Title
Small and Rural Community Clean Water Technical Assistance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB518 (Related) 2017-05-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 89.
SB2800 (Related) 2018-07-10 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
SB2800 (Related) 2018-07-10 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
Subjects
Environmental protection
Government lending and loan guarantees
Rural conditions and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local finance
Water quality
Water use and supply
Government lending and loan guarantees
Rural conditions and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local finance
Water quality
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5030/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5030/BILLS-115hr5030ih.pdf |