US HB5036 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 124-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-11 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H10033)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-11 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H10033)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the application of the rule issued by the Department of Health and Human Services on May 21, 2019, that strengthens the enforcement of conscience and anti-discrimination laws related to the rights of covered health care providers to refuse to participate in certain procedures, such as abortions, sterilization, or assisted suicide.
Title
Put Patients First Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-11 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H10033) |
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-11-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-11-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2836 (Same As) 2019-11-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Health
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Religion
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Health
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Religion
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5036/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5036/BILLS-116hr5036ih.pdf |