US HB5038 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reserve Component Benefits Parity Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reserve Component Benefits Parity Act of 2018

Sponsors

Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN]Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS]Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN]
Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX]
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]
Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN]Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Steve King [R-IA]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]
Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN]Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND]Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA]Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Evan Jenkins [R-WV]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. David Young [R-IA]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2018-02-15HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-02-15HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-02-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1384 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB667 (Related) 2017-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2416 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2987 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 439.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback