US HB5039 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Airmail Museum Act This bill designates the airmail museum located at Smith Field in Fort Wayne, Indiana, as the "National Airmail Museum."
Title
National Airmail Museum Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
SB3402 (Same As) 2018-08-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
SB3402 (Same As) 2018-08-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Indiana
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Postal service
Transportation and public works
Indiana
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Postal service
Transportation and public works
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5039/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5039/BILLS-115hr5039ih.pdf |