US HB5042 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Job Creation through Energy Efficient Manufacturing Act
Title
Job Creation through Energy Efficient Manufacturing Act
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1687 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Buy American requirements
Electric power generation and transmission
Employee hiring
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Industrial facilities
Labor standards
Manufacturing
Metals
Oil and gas
Public-private cooperation
Small business
Buy American requirements
Electric power generation and transmission
Employee hiring
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Industrial facilities
Labor standards
Manufacturing
Metals
Oil and gas
Public-private cooperation
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5042/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5042/BILLS-115hr5042ih.pdf |