US HB513 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the requirements for determining the unrelated business taxable income of tax-exempt organizations. The bill repeals provisions that (1) require organizations with more than one unrelated trade or business to compute unrelated business taxable income separately for each trade or business; and (2) increase unrelated business taxable income by the amount of expenses paid or incurred by an organization for certain fringe benefits for which a tax deduction is not allowed, including benefits relating to transportation, parking, or an on-premises athletic facility.
Title
Nonprofits Support Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1223 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB501 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB632 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1545 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1282 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB501 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB632 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1545 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1282 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Income tax rates
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation
Transportation costs
Income tax rates
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation
Transportation costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/513/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr513/BILLS-116hr513ih.pdf |