US HB5139 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Became Public Law No: 111-177.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Became Public Law No: 111-177.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extending Immunities to the Office of the High Representative and the International Civilian Office in Kosovo Act of 2010 - Amends the International Organizations Immunities Act to authorize: (1) the provisions of such Act to be extended to the Office of the High Representative in Bosnia and Herzegovina (and to its officers and employees) or the International Civilian Office in Kosovo (and to its officers and employees) in the same manner as they may be extended to a public international organization in which the United States participates pursuant to any treaty or under the authority of any Act of Congress authorizing such participation or making an appropriation for such participation; and (2) any such extension to continue to extend to the Office of the High Representative in Bosnia and Herzegovina (and to its officers and employees) or the International Civilian Office in Kosovo (and to its officers and employees) after that Office has been dissolved. Provides that the budgetary effects of this Act for the purpose of complying with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010 shall be determined by reference to the latest statement titled "Budgetary Effects of PAYGO Legislation" for this Act, submitted for printing in the Congressional Record by the Chairman of the House Budget Committee, provided that such statement has been submitted prior to the vote on passage.
Title
Extending Immunities to the Office of the High Representative and the International Civilian Office in Kosovo Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Howard Berman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Became Public Law No: 111-177. | |
2010-06-08 | Signed by President. | |
2010-05-27 | Presented to President. | |
2010-05-24 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-05-20 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-05-20 | Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4104) | |
2010-05-19 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-05-19 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3612) | |
2010-05-19 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5139. | |
2010-05-19 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3612-3613) | |
2010-05-19 | Mr. McMahon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2010-04-26 | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Subjects
Bosnia and Herzegovina
Budget process
Europe
Government liability
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Kosovo
Budget process
Europe
Government liability
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Kosovo