US HB517 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires an alien's "credible fear of persecution" to be more probable than not in order to be eligible for asylum. It also directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to ensure that the questions asked in expedited removal proceedings are done so in a uniform manner, and to record interviews in expedited removal and asylum proceedings. If an asylum seeker needs an interpreter, DHS shall ensure that a competent interpreter is used who is not affiliated with the government of the country the alien is seeking asylum frrom.
Title
Closing Asylum Loopholes Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB574 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB586 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3360 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3855 (Related) 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB586 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3360 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3855 (Related) 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Internet and video services
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sound recording
Administrative remedies
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Internet and video services
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sound recording
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/517/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr517/BILLS-116hr517ih.pdf |