US HB5178 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 481.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 481.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Puerto Rico Small Business Contracting Assistance Act of 2018
Title
Puerto Rico Small Business Contracting Assistance Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 481. |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-628. |
2018-03-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2018-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2873 (Related) 2018-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5929 (Related) 2018-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB5975 (Related) 2018-05-25 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3256 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB2429 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2488 (Related) 2017-05-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB5929 (Related) 2018-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB5975 (Related) 2018-05-25 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3256 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB2429 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2488 (Related) 2017-05-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.