US HB5184 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Safe and Drug-Free Schools and Communities Act to require: (1) states to use grants for safe and drug-free schools to collect and report information on the incidence of bullying and harassment; and (2) local educational agencies (LEAs) and schools to use subgrants to prevent and respond to incidents of bullying and harassment. Requires such LEAs or schools to: (1) notify parents and students annually of conduct prohibited in their school discipline policies, that now must include bullying and harassment; and (2) establish complaint procedures for students and parents to register complaints regarding such conduct. Includes bullying and harassment within the Act's definition of violence.
Title
To amend the Safe and Drug-Free Schools and Communities Act to include bullying and harassment prevention programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Barney Frank [D-MA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. John Olver [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. | |
2010-04-29 | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2262 (Related) 2009-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
SB3739 (Related) 2010-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6896-6897)
SB3739 (Related) 2010-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6896-6897)
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Disability and health-based discrimination
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Performance measurement
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
School administration
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Violent crime
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Disability and health-based discrimination
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Performance measurement
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
School administration
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/5184/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr5184/BILLS-111hr5184ih.pdf |