US HB5193 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Veteran Entrepreneurship Training Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veteran Entrepreneurship Training Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2018-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-03-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB121 (Related) 2017-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback