US HB5199 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 535.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Construction Consensus Procurement Improvement Act of 2016 (Sec. 3) This bill modifies the design-build selection procedures used by federal agencies soliciting offers to enter into civilian contracts for the design and construction of a public building, facility, or work. Two-phase selection procedures (i.e., submission of qualifications and then the submission of price and technical proposals in response to a request for proposal) must be used when a contracting officer determines that a project has a value of $3 million or greater. But for contracts valued at less than $3 million, the contracting officer makes the same determination under current law as to whether the use of two-phase selection procedures is appropriate when the officer anticipates at least three offers for the contract. Federal agencies must report, each year through FY2021, on each instance where the agency awarded a design-build contract in which: (1) more than five finalists were selected for phase-two requests for proposals, or (2) the contract or order was awarded without using two-phase selection procedures. The Government Accountability Office must report on agency compliance with design-build contract procedures. (Sec. 4) The Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council must amend the Federal Acquisition Regulation to prohibit the use of reverse auctions as part of the two-phase selection procedure for awarding contracts for construction and design services. A "reverse auction," with respect to procurement by an agency, is: (1) a real-time auction conducted through an electronic medium among at least two offerors who compete by submitting bids for a supply or service contract with the ability to submit revised lower bids before the closing of the auction; and (2) the award of the contract, delivery order, task order, or purchase order to the offeror based on the price obtained through the auction process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction Consensus Procurement Improvement Act of 2016

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-14HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 535.
2016-07-14HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-691.
2016-05-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2016-05-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2016-05-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
2016-05-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1526 (Related) 2016-10-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 656.
SB3011 (Related) 2016-06-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 505.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback