US HB5201 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 580.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 580.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanently excludes mental health services that are furnished via telehealth from certain originating site requirements under Medicare. Under current law, these telehealth services are excluded from such requirements through the end of the public health emergency relating to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).
Title
Telemental Health Expansion Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 580. |
2020-12-24 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2020-12-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-697, Part I. |
2020-07-15 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4932 (Related) 2019-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2741 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4796 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8527 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Rules, the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2741 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4796 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8527 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Rules, the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Medicare
Mental health
Health care coverage and access
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Medicare
Mental health