US HB5214 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-126. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-126. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a representative payee (i.e., a person designated to receive payments on behalf of a minor, a mentally incompetent individual, or an individual under other legal disability) from embezzling or converting the amounts received from certain retirement funds. If the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) determines that a representative payee has embezzled or converted payments from the Civil Service Retirement System or the Federal Employees Retirement System for a use other than the benefit of the individual on whose behalf such payments were received, OPM shall (1) revoke the certification for payment of benefits to the representative payee, and (2) certify payment to another representative payee or to the individual.
Title
Representative Payee Fraud Prevention Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-126. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-03-18 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-03-09 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1444) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2020-02-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H806-807) |
2020-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5214. |
2020-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H806-808) |
2020-02-05 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-12-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-11-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1430 (Related) 2019-11-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Disability and paralysis
Employee benefits and pensions
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Disability and paralysis
Employee benefits and pensions
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics