US HB522 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stop Settlement Slush Funds Act of 2017 This bill prohibits government officials from entering into or enforcing a settlement agreement resolving a civil action on behalf of the United States that provides for a payment to any person or entity other than the United States. The bill provides exceptions to allow payments that remedy actual harm (including to the environment) caused by the party making the payment or that constitute payment for services rendered in connection with the case. Government officials or agents who violate this prohibition may be removed from office or required to forfeit to the government any money they hold for such purposes to which they may otherwise be entitled. Federal agencies must report annually for seven years to the Congressional Budget Office about the parties, funding sources, and distribution of funds for their settlement agreements permitted by the exceptions in this bill. Agency inspectors general must report annually to Congress about any of their agency's settlement agreements that violate this bill.
Title
Stop Settlement Slush Funds Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] | Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] |
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] |
Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. David Trott [R-MI] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB732 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB333 (Related) 2017-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR577 (Similar To) 2017-10-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB333 (Related) 2017-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR577 (Similar To) 2017-10-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government liability
Government studies and investigations
Law
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Congressional oversight
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government liability
Government studies and investigations
Law
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/522/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr522/BILLS-115hr522ih.pdf |