US HB5233 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends for two years the temporary scheduling order issued by the Drug Enforcement Administration to place fentanyl-related substances in schedule I of the Controlled Substances Act. The temporary order expires on February 6, 2020.
Title
Extend Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-11-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Crime and law enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Crime and law enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5233/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5233/BILLS-116hr5233ih.pdf |