US HB524 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(1) modifies the boundary of the Deschutes Canyon-Steelhead Falls Wilderness Study Area in Oregon to exclude approximately 688 acres of public land; and (2) directs the Department of the Interior to manage such land to improve fire resiliency and forest health, including the conduct of wildfire prevention and response activities.
Title
Crooked River Ranch Fire Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
SB81 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB81 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Forests, forestry, trees
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/524/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr524/BILLS-116hr524ih.pdf |