US HB5245 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To transfer Coast Guard property in the Town of Jupiter Island, Florida, for inclusion in Hobe Sound National Wildlife Refuge.
Title
To transfer Coast Guard property in the Town of Jupiter Island, Florida, for inclusion in Hobe Sound National Wildlife Refuge.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-03-22 | House | For Further Action See H.R.5319. |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5319 (Related) 2018-11-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 795.
SB2647 (Related) 2018-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB140 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 115-282.
SB2647 (Related) 2018-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB140 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 115-282.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5245/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5245/BILLS-115hr5245ih.pdf |