US HB525 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes statutory authority and requirements for a partnership between health insurance plans, government agencies, law enforcement, and health care organizations in order to detect and prevent health care waste, fraud, and abuse. The partnership must be established under the Health Care Fraud and Abuse Control Program, which is administered by the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) and the Department of Justice (DOJ). Among other requirements, the partnership must (1) promote data sharing between partners, (2) analyze data to identify fraudulent practices, (3) refer potential criminal cases to law enforcement, and (4) conduct education and outreach. Currently, HHS and DOJ administer the Healthcare Fraud Prevention Partnership. The purpose of the partnership is to address health care fraud through voluntary data sharing between public and private sectors; the partnership was created in 2012 through agency action. The bill transfers all functions, personnel, assets, liabilities, and administrative actions of this partnership to the partnership established under the bill.
Title
Strengthening the Health Care Fraud Prevention Task Force Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-02-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-02-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2053-2054) |
2019-02-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 525. |
2019-02-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2053-2055) |
2019-02-25 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health information and medical records
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Public-private cooperation
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health information and medical records
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Public-private cooperation