US HB526 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the President to impose sanctions on individuals responsible for acts to undermine democracy in Cambodia, including acts that constituted serious human rights violations. The sanctions shall be directed at senior Cambodian government, military, or security forces officials responsible for such actions, as well as entities controlled or owned by such individuals. The sanctions shall include blocking assets and restricting the entry of sanctioned individuals into the United States, and shall not apply to the importation of goods. The President may waive the sanctions with respect to a person or entity if it is in the national interest of the United States. The President may suspend the sanctions if Cambodia makes meaningful progress toward ending government efforts to undermine democracy or committing human rights violations.
Title
Cambodia Democracy Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-07-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5802-5803) |
2019-07-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 526. |
2019-07-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5802-5805) |
2019-07-15 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-04-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3081 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Asia
Cambodia
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign property
Human rights
International affairs
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
Cambodia
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign property
Human rights
International affairs
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers