US HB5307 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-220. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-220. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 115 Nicol Avenue in Thomasville, Alabama, as the "Postmaster Robert Ingram Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 115 Nicol Avenue in Thomasville, Alabama, as the "Postmaster Robert Ingram Sr. Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] |
Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-220. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-17 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-11 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7220-7221) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-09-30 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5070) |
2020-09-30 | House | H.Amdt.895 On agreeing to the Connolly amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | H.Amdt.895 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Connolly. (consideration: CR H5070; text: CR H5070) |
2020-09-30 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5070) |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged. |
2020-09-30 | House | Mr. Connolly asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2020-03-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-12-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Alabama
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service