US HB5312 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-11)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a commission to develop voluntary guidelines for postsecondary electronic instruction materials and related technologies. Specifically, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, the President pro tempore of the Senate, and the Secretary of Education must establish an independent commission to (1) develop and issue voluntary accessibility guidelines for postsecondary electronic instructional materials and related technologies, (2) develop a model framework for pilot testing such materials and technologies, and (3) produce an annotated list of information technology standards. The Department of Education must review and, as appropriate, update the voluntary guidelines, pilot testing framework, and information technology standards every five years.
Title
AIM HIGH Act Accessible Instructional Materials in Higher Education Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-12-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4643 (Related) 2019-10-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4674 (Related) 2020-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 583.
SB3095 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4674 (Related) 2020-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 583.
SB3095 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Education
Disability and paralysis
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Educational technology and distance education
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Education
Disability and paralysis
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Educational technology and distance education
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5312/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5312/BILLS-116hr5312ih.pdf |