US HB5316 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Temporarily authorizes the Department of the Interior to conduct activities to accelerate and complete repairs to certain water conveyance facilities in western states. The bill also authorizes additional activities related to implementation of the San Joaquin River restoration settlement, which resolved a legal dispute regarding fish populations and water supply in the San Joaquin River in California.
Title
Move Water Now Act
Sponsors
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 15. |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-12-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-12-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
California
Dams and canals
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Dams and canals
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5316/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5316/BILLS-116hr5316ih.pdf |