US HB532 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E174-175)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E174-175)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Employees Paid Parental Leave Act of 2015 Allows federal employees to substitute any available paid leave for any leave without pay available for either the: (1) birth of a child, or (2) placement of a child with the employee for either adoption or foster care. Makes available (subject to specified requirements) for any of the 12 weeks of leave an employee is entitled to for such purposes: (1) six administrative weeks of paid parental leave in connection with the birth or placement involved, and (2) any accumulated annual or sick leave. Authorizes the Director of the Office of Personnel Management to promulgate regulations to increase the amount of paid parental leave available to such an employee to a total of 12 administrative workweeks, based on the consideration of: (1) the benefits to the federal government, including enhanced recruitment and employee retention; (2) the cost to the government; (3) trends in the private sector and in state and local governments; (4) the federal government's role as a model employer; and (5) the impact of increased paid parental leave on lower-income and economically disadvantaged employees and their children. Amends the Congressional Accountability Act of 1995 and the Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993 to allow the same substitution for covered congressional employees, Government Accountability Office (GAO) employees, and Library of Congress employees. Counts certain service by an employee of the executive branch, Congress, GAO, or the Library of Congress while on active duty as a member of the National Guard or Reserves as service for that branch or agency for purposes of determining such employee's eligibility to take or substitute leave as provided under this Act.
Title
Federal Employees Paid Parental Leave Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E174-175) |
2015-01-27 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E119) |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House Administration |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2033 (Related) 2015-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2814 (Related) 2016-04-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2814 (Related) 2016-04-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Adoption and foster care
Congressional agencies
Congressional officers and employees
Employee leave
Family relationships
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Library of Congress
National Guard and reserves
Office of Personnel Management (OPM)
Adoption and foster care
Congressional agencies
Congressional officers and employees
Employee leave
Family relationships
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Library of Congress
National Guard and reserves
Office of Personnel Management (OPM)
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/532/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr532/BILLS-114hr532ih.pdf |