US HB5324 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out a two-year pilot program on information sharing between the VA and designated persons regarding the assistance and benefits available to veterans. Under the program, volunteer participants who are in the Armed Forces and are transitioning to civilian life shall designate up to 10 persons to receive information on specified services and benefits from the VA.
Title
Sergeant Daniel Somers Veterans Network of Support Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-12-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-12-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-12-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2864 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Held at the desk.
HB8247 (Related) 2020-12-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-214. (TXT | PDF)
HB8247 (Related) 2020-12-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-214. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health promotion and preventive care
Military personnel and dependents
Performance measurement
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health promotion and preventive care
Military personnel and dependents
Performance measurement
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5324/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5324/BILLS-116hr5324ih.pdf |