US HB5326 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 794.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 794.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Maritime Technical Corrections Act of 2018
Title
Maritime Technical Corrections Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 794. |
2018-11-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-1015. |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-12 | House | Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged. |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2018-03-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2018-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.