US HB5326 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits, and nullifies any existing, pre-dispute arbitration agreements with respect to Medicare skilled nursing facilities or Medicaid nursing facilities, home- and community-based services, or home health care services.
Title
Fairness in Nursing Home Arbitration Act
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-12-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5216 (Related) 2019-11-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2943 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2943 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medicare
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5326/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5326/BILLS-116hr5326ih.pdf |