US HB5330 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 537.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 537.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restricts the inclusion of medical debt on a consumer credit report. A consumer reporting agency is prohibited from including on a consumer credit report, and a person is prohibited from reporting to such agency (1) medical debt arising from a medically necessary procedure, or (2) other medical debt less than a year old. A person reporting medical debt to a consumer reporting agency must first provide notice to that consumer regarding the restrictions on including medical debt on credit reports. Furthermore, a debt collector is prohibited from collecting a medical debt less than two years old.
Title
Consumer Protection for Medical Debt Collections Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 537. |
2020-12-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-653. |
2019-12-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 24. |
2019-12-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-12-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1581 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.